EP0837920 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THERMALLY PROCESSING HOSPITAL WASTE AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENVIROTEC GROUP LIMITED 24 Finch Road Douglas Isle of Man / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states ENVIROTEC GROUP LIMITED 24 Finch Road Douglas Isle of Man / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANELIS, Georgi ul. Tretia, 3-1 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 02 /
POLIANTCHIK, Evgeni ul. Zentralnaia, 12-a-50 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 03 /
IAKOVLEVA, Galina ul. Zentralnaia, 18-192 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 04 /
STESIK, Lev ul. Tretia, 3-3 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 05 /
GLAZOV, Sergei Chkolny blvr, 18-87 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 06 /
TCHERVONNY, Alexandr ul. Zentralnaia, 18-181 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 07 /
FOURSOV, Viktor ul. Zentralnaia, 12-62 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU | 08 /
ALKOV, Nikolai ul. Eletskaia, 12/2-168 Moscou, 115573 / RU | 09 /
NIKOULINE, Iouri ul. Koulakova, 4/1-183 Moscou, 123181 / RU | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Pontet, Bernard Pontet Allano & Associés Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint Aubin 91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Pontet, Bernard Pontet & Allano s.a.r.l. 25 rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95924898.0 | 22.06.1995 | [1998/18] | WO1995EP02416 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600266 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837920 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837920 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10B53/00, F23G5/027 | [1998/18] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG VON KRANKENHAUSABFÄLLEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [1998/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THERMALLY PROCESSING HOSPITAL WASTE AND THE LIKE | [1998/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER A CHAUD DES DECHETS HOSPITALIERS ET ANALOGUES | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/45] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/13] | 19.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/13] | 02.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.1999 | ES | 15.09.1999 | GB | 15.09.1999 | IT | 15.09.1999 | NL | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | DK | 15.12.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
ES | 15.09.1999 | ||
GB | 15.09.1999 | ||
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
DK | 15.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
ES | 15.09.1999 | ||
GB | 15.09.1999 | ||
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
ES | 15.09.1999 | ||
GB | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
GB | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
GB | 15.09.1999 | ||
IE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/07] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
GB | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 15.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0188073 (WILLIAMS) [X] 1-3,6-9,12-19 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0257019 (VOEST-ALPINE); | [A]JPS6310695 ; | [A]DE2202979 (THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA) [A] 3,10,11; | [AD]FR2649782 (HURET); | [AD]EP0251269 (GRINDI) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880615), vol. 12, no. 209, Database accession no. (C - 504), & JP63010695 A 00000000 (ISHIHARA TAKAO) [A] * abstract * |