EP0774116 - METHOD FOR SCREENING COMPOUND LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARMAN, Andrew, John 15 Peel Hall Lane Ashton Chester CH3 8DE / GB | 02 /
HOLLAND, Janet, Dora 20 Meadway Poynton Cheshire SK12 1DZ / GB | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Brown, Andrew Stephen, et al AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Brown, Andrew Stephen, et al AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | ||
Former [1999/37] | Giles, David Eric, et al AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | ||
Former [1997/21] | Phillips, Neil Godfrey Alasdair, et al Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 95925915.1 | 19.07.1995 | [1997/21] | WO1995GB01700 | Priority number, date | GB19940014770 | 22.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9414770 | GB19950010137 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: GB 9510137 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603647 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774116 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774116 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP);
G01N33/50 (EP);
G01N33/582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] |
Former [1997/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 24.02.1997 | LV | 24.02.1997 | SI | 24.02.1997 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHTUNG EINER BIBLIOTHEK VON CHEMISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [1997/21] | English: | METHOD FOR SCREENING COMPOUND LIBRARIES | [1997/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE DE BANQUES DE COMPOSES | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1999 | GR | 03.11.1999 | PT | 03.02.2000 | IE | 19.07.2000 | LU | 19.07.2000 | MC | 31.07.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 03.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9324517 (FURKA ARPAD [HU], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [DY]WO9402515 (BUNSEN RUSH LAB INC [US]) [DY] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9408051 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - G. T. WANG ET AL., "Design and synthesis of new fluorogenic HIV protease substrates based on resonance energy transfer.", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (19901029), vol. 31, no. 45, pages 6493 - 6496 [Y] 3,4 * the whole document * | [DY] - G. MATHIS., "Rare earth cryptates and homogenous fluoroimmunoassays with human sera.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WINSTON US, vol. 39, no. 9, pages 1953 - 1959 [DY] 3,4,6 * the whole document * |