EP0775032 - AN INDEXABLE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. P.O. Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZITZLAFF, Wolfgang Aurtiefeu Boru 1 D-6367 Karbeu 3 / DE | 02 /
SCHUTZ, Edgar Steiuweg 4 D-5439 Fehl-Ritzenhausen / DE | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95926239.5 | 12.07.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US08669 | Priority number, date | DE19944428514 | 11.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4428514 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605009 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775032 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775032 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
C02F1/4672 (EP);
B23B27/141 (EP);
B23B2200/321 (EP);
C02F2305/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | EIN WENDESCHNEIDEINSATZ | [1997/22] | English: | AN INDEXABLE INSERT | [1997/22] | French: | PLAQUETTE AMOVIBLE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 12.07.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2000/07] | LU | 31.07.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4214846 (KRAEMER ROLF H [US]); | [A]EP0143758 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 22; figures 1,2 * |