|
26.01.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.03.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |