|
22.01.2013 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.08.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.07.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.05.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
03.05.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |