|
25.03.2008 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
01.08.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
11.06.2002 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Claim deemed abandoned |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.05.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
25.04.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |