EP0791140 - SECURING COMPONENT FOR A BODY IN A WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moto Meter GmbH Daimlerstrasse 6 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | [1997/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAASS, Manfred Murgstrasse 5 D-76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael Fliederstrasse 26 D-76307 Karlsbad / DE | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Friedmann, Jürgen, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Friedmann, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing., et al c/o Robert Bosch GmbH, Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95934055.5 | 13.10.1995 | [1997/35] | WO1995DE01410 | Priority number, date | DE19944439797 | 08.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4439797 | [1997/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614512 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791140 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791140 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16B9/02, G10K11/00 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
G10K11/004 (EP,US);
F16B2200/40 (EP,US);
F16B2200/69 (EP,US);
F16B2200/71 (EP,US);
Y10S403/14 (EP,US);
Y10S411/913 (EP,US);
Y10T24/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/35] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINEN KÖRPER IN EINER WANDUNG | [1997/35] | English: | SECURING COMPONENT FOR A BODY IN A WALL | [1997/35] | French: | ELEMENT PERMETTANT DE FIXER UN CORPS DANS UNE PAROI | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB679441 (UNITED CARR FASTENER CORP) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 117; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US3545387 (GIAMBALVO JOSEPH) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-9 *; | [X]GB1581773 (GILBARCO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3812182 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,10* figures 1-12; claims 1,12 * |