|
05.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
34 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.09.2005 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.08.2005 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2005 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
32 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1999 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.05.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.04.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |