EP0736364 - STYRENE RESIN PELLETS AND PRODUCT OF MOLDING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2001/30] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAYAMA, Michio Idemitsu Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken 299-01 / JP | 02 /
FUKUI, Hiroki Idemitsu Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken 299-01 / JP | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95934837.6 | 19.10.1995 | [1996/41] | WO1995JP02140 | Priority number, date | JP19940255070 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: JP 25507094 | [1996/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612597 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736364 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736364 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/14 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
B29B9/14 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP);
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08J5/08 (EP);
C08J5/248 (EP);
B29B7/90 (EP);
B29B9/06 (EP);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP);
C08J2351/06 (EP);
C08J2451/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/41] | Title | German: | STYROLHARZPELLETS UND DARAUS GEFORMTE GEGENSTÄNDE | [1996/41] | English: | STYRENE RESIN PELLETS AND PRODUCT OF MOLDING THEREOF | [1996/41] | French: | GRANULES DE RESINE SYNTHETIQUE A BASE DE STYRENE ET SON PRODUIT DE MOULAGE | [1996/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1996 | Translation filed | 13.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 13.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2001 | BE | 25.07.2001 | CH | 25.07.2001 | LI | 25.07.2001 | NL | 25.07.2001 | SE | 25.10.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2015/21] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 25.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0501625 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9424206 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [PA] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH04175108 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH05247292 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) |