|
18.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.04.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.10.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2005 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2005 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.06.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
28 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Annex |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
54 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |