EP0744207 - CATALYST STRUCTURE AND GAS PURIFICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-2, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Yasuyoshi, Kure Research Laboratory Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-36, Takara- machi, Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Tomihisa Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-9,Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 03 /
NAGAI, Yoshinori Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-9 Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 04 /
MORITA, Isato Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-9,Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 05 /
MUKAI, Masato Kure Works of Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 06 /
YAMADA, Akihiro Kure Works of Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 07 /
MICHIMOTO, Takashi Kure Works of Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 08 /
MORII, Masaharu Bab-Hitachi Engineering Co., Ltd. 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi Hiroshima 737 / JP | 09 /
KURODA, Hiroshi Babcock-Hitachi Kabushiki Kaisha 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936791.3 | 14.11.1995 | [1996/48] | WO1995JP02323 | Priority number, date | JP19940280869 | 15.11.1994 Original published format: JP 28086994 | JP19950007112 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: JP 711295 | JP19950085636 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8563695 | JP19950191648 | 27.07.1995 Original published format: JP 19164895 | JP19950196744 | 01.08.1995 Original published format: JP 19674495 | [1996/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614920 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744207 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744207 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/38, B01J35/02, B01J35/04 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
F01N3/2821 (EP,US);
B01J35/00 (EP,FI,KR,US);
B01D53/38 (FI);
B01D53/8631 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,FI,KR,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,FI,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSTRUKTUR UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GASREINIGUNG | [1996/48] | English: | CATALYST STRUCTURE AND GAS PURIFICATION APPARATUS | [1996/48] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CATALYSEUR ET APPAREIL DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ | [1996/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1996 | Translation filed | 24.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00106440.1 / EP1027917 | EP02023383.9 / EP1284155 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8705723U ; | [Y]DE8527885U ; | [XY]EP0433222 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [PX]DE4316132 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | International search | [X]JPS6128377B ; | [X]JPH0268145 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) |