|
04.07.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1998 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1997 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1997 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.01.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |