|
04.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.10.2005 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.04.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.09.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |