|
02.12.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
17.05.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.03.2004 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Withdrawal of application |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.12.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
18.08.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.12.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
07.12.1995 |
Priority document |
Opposition |
16 |