|
06.03.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
36 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.06.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
23 |
|
29.04.2005 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.11.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.03.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Annex |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.06.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |