|
15.02.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
14.06.2005 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
64 |
|
13.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
65 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2005 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.09.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.08.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1997 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.02.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |