|
03.09.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
182 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
136 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
16.10.2003 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.05.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2003 |
Annex |
Appeal |
192 |
|
25.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2003 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
04.09.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1997 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.1997 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.07.1997 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.1996 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.09.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.02.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
214 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
98 |