EP0726418 - Hose connection, particularly for connecting hoses such as garden hoses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GARDENA Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Strasse 40 89079 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states GARDENA Kress + Kastner GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Strasse 40 D-89079 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101314.1 | 31.01.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | DE1995103722 | 04.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19503722 | [1996/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0726418 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0726418 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726418 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/22 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
F16L33/222 (EP,US);
F16L33/223 (EP,US);
F16L33/224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | Schlauchanschluss, insbesondere zum Anschluss von Schläuchen, wie Gartenschläuchen | [1996/33] | English: | Hose connection, particularly for connecting hoses such as garden hoses | [1996/33] | French: | Connexion de tuyaux souples, en particulier pour connecter des tuyaux flexibles tels que des tuyaux d'arrosage | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00111750.6 / EP1026434 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Request for further processing for: | 02.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US996114 (MUELLER FRANK X [US]) [YD] 8 * figure . *; | [XA]DE530956 (JOSEF CHRISTGEN) [X] 1,3-6,9 * figure - * [A] 2,7,8; | [XAY]DE696917 (ROTADISK APPBAU G M B H) [X] 1-6,9 * figure - * [A] 7 [Y] 8; | [XA]FR2398958 (LEGRIS FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,9 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,8; | [A]DE3133837 (GARDENA KRESS & KASTNER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9* figure . * |