EP0736343 - Sheet tightening device, particularly for repairing car bodies, or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giovignani, Francesco Via Cossut 21 57100 Livorno / IT | [1996/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. - Savona Via F. Baracca 1R, 4° piano "Il Gabbiano" 17100 Savona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro, Dipl.-Phys. Via Pecorile 27/B 17015 Celle Ligure (Savona) / IT | Application number, filing date | 96105327.9 | 03.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | IT1995LI00003U | 06.04.1995 Original published format: IT LI950003 U | [1996/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736343 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736343 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/14 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
B21D1/145 (EP);
B25B5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/41] | Extension states | SI | 04.04.1996 | Title | German: | Blechspanneinrichtung, insbesondere für die Reparatur von Fahrzeugkarosserien oder dergleichen | [1996/41] | English: | Sheet tightening device, particularly for repairing car bodies, or the like | [1996/41] | French: | Dispositif de serrage de tôle en particulier pour réparer des carrosseries de véhicules automobiles ou analogue | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 03.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   31.07.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0088854 (CELETTE SA) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2314023 (WILMONDA) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3986746 (CHARTIER GUY NORMAN) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3355777 (MOJELSKI) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2362296 (NIKE HYDRAULIK AB) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3955249 (SHIOZAKI HIROMITSU); | [A]US4037456 (JARMAN DAVIS R); | [A]EP0537038 (BLACKHAWK) |