EP0740269 - Scaling compressed images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Natarajan, Balas K. 18079 Reed Knoll Road Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106223.9 | 19.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | US19950427918 | 26.04.1995 Original published format: US 427918 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740269 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740269 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G06T9/00 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
H04N19/48 (EP,US);
H04N19/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | Skalierung von komprimierten Datenbildern | [1996/44] | English: | Scaling compressed images | [1996/44] | French: | Mise à échelle d'images comprimées | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 01.04.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SHIH-FU CHANG ET AL, "Manipulation and compositing of MC-DCT compressed video", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, JAN. 1995, USA, ISSN 0733-8716, vol. 13, no. 1, pages 1 - 11, XP000492740 [X] 1-8 * page 5, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.363151 | [X] - KING NGI NGAN ET AL, "Lowpass filtering in the cosine transform domain", ICC '80. 1980 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, SEATTLE, WA, USA, 8-12 JUNE 1980, 1980, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 31.7/1 - 5, XP000577427 [X] 1-8 * page 3173, column L, line 1 - line 6; figure 4 * | [A] - LEE J B ET AL, "Transform domain filtering based on pipelining structure", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, AUG. 1992, USA, ISSN 1053-587X, vol. 40, no. 8, pages 2061 - 2064, XP000309978 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.150006 | [A] - YOON YUNG LEE ET AL, "Video post-production with compressed images", SMPTE JOURNAL, FEB. 1994, USA, ISSN 0036-1682, vol. 103, no. 2, pages 76 - 84, XP000429905 | [A] - SMITH B C, "Fast software processing of motion JPEG video", PROCEEDINGS ACM MULTIMEDIA '94, PROCEEDINGS OF ACM MULTIMEDIA 94, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 15-20 OCT. 1994, ISBN 0-89791-686-7, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, ACM, USA, pages 77 - 88, XP000610942 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/192593.192628 | [A] - CHANG S -F, "New algorithms for processing images in the transform-compressed domain", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING '95, TAIPEI, TAIWAN, 24-26 MAY 1995, ISSN 0277-786X, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 1995, USA, vol. 2501, pt.1, pages 445 - 454, XP000610425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.206751 | [A] - SMITH B C ET AL, "Algorithms for manipulating compressed images", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, SEPT. 1993, USA, ISSN 0272-1716, vol. 13, no. 5, pages 34 - 42, XP000562744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.232097 |