|
26.01.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
18.06.2009 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.05.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.03.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.09.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.11.2002 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2001 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1996 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.07.1996 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |