|
18.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2006 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
23 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
23.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.02.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |