|
25.03.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
21 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
36 |
|
03.06.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.04.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.03.2005 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.03.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
38 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.09.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.08.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2000 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |