|
22.07.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Communication: Transfer of procedural status |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.01.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
27 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.10.2000 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.1998 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1998 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1998 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1998 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.02.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
45 |