EP0770699 - Manufacturing of water-repellent coating on optical substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dombrowski, Reiner Im Failing 21 64739 Höchst / DE | 02 /
Friz, Martin, Dr. Waldstrasse 21 64367 Mühltal / DE | [1997/18] | Application number, filing date | 96116564.4 | 16.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | DE1995139789 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19539789 | [1997/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770699 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770699 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770699 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/12, G02B1/10, C03C17/30 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/12 (EP,US);
G02B1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/18] | Title | German: | Herstellung von wasserabweisenden Beschichtungen auf optischen Substraten | [1997/18] | English: | Manufacturing of water-repellent coating on optical substrate | [1997/18] | French: | Préparation d'une couche imperméable sur un substrat optique | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.10.2002 | ES | 17.10.2002 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 16.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05170487 ; | [A]JPH05323107 ; | [A]JPH06122962 ; | [A]JPH05239243 ; | [DA]JPH05215905 ; | [XY]DE3701654 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 3, line 31 - line 39 * * page 4, line 1 - line 19 * * page 8, line 40 - line 46 * * claims 1,3,4 * [Y] 4-6; | [A]EP0367438 (AM INT [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 7, line 11 - column 8, line 32 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 15 * * claim - *; | [A]US4944962 (FURUTA SHOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 15 * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0561016 (TAIRA TETSUSABURO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 2, line 9 - line 44 * * example -; claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 32, Database accession no. 93-252524, XP002077601 & JPH05170487 A 19930709 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940309), vol. 018, no. 142, Database accession no. (P - 1706), & JP05323107 A 19931207 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 23, Database accession no. 94-186606, XP002077602 & JPH06122962 A 19940506 (NASU NIKON KK) [A] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931222), vol. 017, no. 704, Database accession no. (C - 1146), & JP05239243 A 19930917 (SHINKURON:KK) [A] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 39, Database accession no. 93-305924, XP002077603 & JPH05215905 A 19930827 (HOYA CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05215905 |