EP0771756 - Pallet for a passenger conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY 10 Farm Springs Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelke, Bernward Holztorstr. 2, Sarstedt 31157 Stadthagen / DE | 02 /
Ostermeier, Jörg Kiesweg 304, Bückeburg 31675 Stadthagen / DE | 03 /
Borchers, Peter Enzer Str. 127B 31655 Stadthagen / DE | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117171.7 | 25.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | US19950550975 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: US 550975 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0771756 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0771756 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771756 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/12 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B66B23/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/19] | Title | German: | Palette für einen Personenbeförderer | [1997/19] | English: | Pallet for a passenger conveyor | [1997/19] | French: | Palette pour un transporteur de passagers | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2114930 (MOSSNER ALUMINIUM METAL, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5358089 (RIEDEL HANS-DIETER [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 2 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO9222491 (JONES GRAHAM HENRY [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 * |