|
18.11.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.10.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.08.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Board of Appeal mail |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
33 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.08.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.11.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.07.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |