EP0775690 - Process for the preparation of N-lauroyl-L-glutamic acid dimethylester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/52] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelhardt, Fritz, Dr. 131 Harbour Watch Drive Chesapeake, Virginia 23320 / US | 02 /
Müller, Manfred Untere Schönau 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 03 /
Wessling, Michael, Dr. Spessartstrasse 11c 63477 Maintal-Bischofsheim / DE | [1997/22] | Application number, filing date | 96118447.0 | 18.11.1996 | [1997/22] | Priority number, date | DE1995143792 | 24.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19543792 | [1997/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775690 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775690 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/12, C07C233/47, C07B41/12 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
C07C231/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/25] |
Former [1997/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Lauroyl-L-glutaminsäuredimethylester | [1997/22] | English: | Process for the preparation of N-lauroyl-L-glutamic acid dimethylester | [1997/22] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de l'ester diméthylique de l'acide N-lauroyl-L-glutamique | [1997/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS54128513 ; | [A]JPS60105645 ; | [A]JPS6248648 ; | [Y] - JAIN, J. C. ET AL., "A new approach for esterification of amino acids.", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, SECTION B, (1977), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 766 - 767, XP002026651 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - BEILSTEINS HANDBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, vierte Auflage, drittes Ergänzungswerk, Bd 4, Teil 2, Seite 1545, BERLIN.GÖTTINGEN.HEIDELBERG, DE, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1963), XP002026652 [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0002] * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 46, Database accession no. 79-83176B, XP002026653 & JPS54128513 A 19791005 (DAI-ICHI KAGAKU YAK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851003), vol. 009, no. 247, Database accession no. (C - 307), & JP60105645 A 19850611 (YASUMITSU TAMURA) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870807), vol. 011, no. 242, Database accession no. (C - 438), & JP62048648 A 19870303 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |