blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0775601

EP0775601 - Tyre with a safety ring incorperating a pressure sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE
12, Cours Sablon
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex 01 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/22]For all designated states
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE
12, Cours Sablon
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex 01 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Drieux, Jean-Jacques
4, rue des Ecoles
63530 Volvic / FR
[1997/22]
Representative(s)Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/22]Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis
Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD
63040 Clermont Ferrand Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date96118525.319.11.1996
[1997/22]
Priority number, dateFR1995001452127.11.1995         Original published format: FR 9514521
[1997/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0775601
Date:28.05.1997
Language:FR
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0775601
Date:24.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60C23/04
[1997/22]
CPC:
B60C23/0408 (EP); B60C23/04985 (EP,US); B60C17/04 (EP);
B60C23/04 (EP); B60C2017/068 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/22]
TitleGerman:Rad mit Sicherheitsstütze und eingebautem Druckmessfühler[1999/51]
English:Tyre with a safety ring incorperating a pressure sensor[1997/22]
French:Roue avec appui de sécurité et capteur de pression incorporé[1997/22]
Former [1997/22]Reifen mit einer inneren Notlauffläche mit integriertem Drucksensor
Examination procedure28.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
23.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2000Fee for grant paid
21.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2191453  (SAVAGE BERNARD JOHN) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 36 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0407126  (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 4,5* column 5, line 32 - line 42; figure 6 *;
 [DY]US5285189  (NOWICKI DONALD V [US], et al) [DY] 1-3 * column 4, line 36 - line 63; figure - *
by applicantUS5285189
 WO9420317
 FR2713558
 FR2713557
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.