EP0783028 - Water-soluble azo dyes, process for their preparation and the use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG Eschenheimer Tor 2 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dannheim, Jörg, Dr. Strubbergstrasse 32 60489 Frankfurt / DE | [1997/28] | Application number, filing date | 96120059.9 | 13.12.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | DE1995148429 | 22.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19548429 | [1997/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783028 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783028 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/09, C09B62/513 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
C09B62/4415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/28] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Azofarbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1997/28] | English: | Water-soluble azo dyes, process for their preparation and the use thereof | [1997/28] | French: | Colorants azoiques solubles dans l'eau, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2008144 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1-6,9-11 * examples 77-82; claims 1,2,4-10,22-27 * [Y] 7,8; | [D]US4323497 (HOYER ERNST, et al); | [Y]EP0235521 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0265828 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-11* example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0387579 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * Beispiele 1,3,4,7,8,53-57,66-69 *;; claims 1-3,5,7 *; | [Y]EP0458743 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * Seite 50, Zeilen 36-49; Seite 51, Zeilen 19-34; Seite 58, Zeilen 40-45; Beispiele 1,2,8; Ansprüche 1-7 *; | [XY]EP0625549 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,3-5,8-11 * page 30, line 42 - page 31, line L; example 60 * [Y] 2,6,7 | by applicant | DE172790 | DE1126542 | DE1150163 | DE1153029 | DE1204666 | DE1276842 | DE1278041 | DE1943904 | DE2034591 | DE2049664 | DE2100080 | DE2142728 | DE2154943 | DE2746109 | US4323497 | EP0172790 | DE3917046 |