EP0780077 - Bundling strap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. WILLPÜTZ KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS GMBH Kirschbaumweg 16 D-50996 Köln / DE | [1997/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willpütz, Wilhelm Westhovener Weg 2 50999 Köln / DE | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Freischem, Stephan Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Freischem, Stephan Patentanwälte Freischem An Gross St. Martin 2 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120193.6 | 16.12.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | DE1995220367U | 22.12.1995 Original published format: DE 29520367 U | DE1996204443U | 11.03.1996 Original published format: DE 29604443 U | [1997/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0780077 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780077 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/14 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
A47G25/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/44] |
Former [1997/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bündellasche | [1997/26] | English: | Bundling strap | [1997/26] | French: | Bande de liaison | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 10.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.09.2005 | [2005/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL7100085 (VAN KUYK) [X] 1,6-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4296959 (HELBIG ROLF W) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4779746 (USNER DANIEL C [US]) [A] 4,6,14 * column 3, line 45 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0433238 (BEER DANIEL HARTOG DE [NL]) |