EP0782941 - Method and device for control of the electric power distribution in a motor vehicle, especially with hybride drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 2501 Biel / CH | [1998/49] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states SMH Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 CH-2501 Biel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theurillat, Patrick Chemin de la Villette 5 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | 02 /
Francescutto, Gianni Chemin de la Scierie 37 2504 Bienne / CH | 03 /
Apter, Robert Rue J.A. Venel 3 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | Balsters, Robert, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A., 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 96120329.6 | 18.12.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | FR19960000093 | 05.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9600093 | [1997/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782941 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782941 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/12, B60L11/18, B60L15/20 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60L15/2045 (EP,US);
B60L50/13 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,US);
B60L2240/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/527 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60W2710/086 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der elektrischen Energieverteilung in einem Kraftfahrzeug, insbesondere mit Hybridantrieb | [1997/28] | English: | Method and device for control of the electric power distribution in a motor vehicle, especially with hybride drive | [1997/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour régler la répartition de la puissance électrique dans un véhicule automobile, notamment à propulsion hybride | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 21.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.03.2003 | NL | 19.03.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 19.03.2003 | |
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | NL | 19.03.2003 | |
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 19.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4116899 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [DA] 1,10 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0460850 (JAGUAR CARS [GB]) [DA] 1,10 * column A; figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9307022 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DA] 1,10 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0543390 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,10 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4344053 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,10* abstract *; | [DA]EP0645278 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,10 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A] - O. VITTONE, "FIAT CONCEPTUAL APPROACH TO HYBRID CARS DESIGN", 12TH INTERNATIONAL ELECTRIC VEHICLE SYMPOSIUM, ANAHEIM US, (19941205), pages 458 - 469, XP000488445 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4116899 | EP0460850 | WO9307022 | EP0543390 | EP0645278 |