|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.03.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.10.2004 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.1997 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.1997 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
22.10.1996 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.10.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |