|
25.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
27 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.04.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
F3029 Communication of loss of rights: non-submission of the translation of the notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
23 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.1997 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |