EP0770798 - Clutch assembly for an automatic mechanical transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gooch, Douglas Craig 8086 Yorkville Lane Richland, Michigan / US | 02 /
Waling, Loyd Alan 8712 N.24th Street, Kalamazoo Michigan / US | 03 /
Steurer, John Scott 1118 Lynn Avenue, Kalamazoo Michigan 49008-2953 / US | [1997/28] |
Former [1997/18] | 01 /
Gooch, Douglas Craig 8086 Yorkville Lane Richland, Michigan / US | ||
02 /
Waling, Loyd Alan 8712 N.24th Street, Kalamazoo Michigan / US | |||
03 /
Steurer, John Scott 1219 Cherry, Kalamazoo Michigan / US | Representative(s) | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Eaton B.V. P.O.Box 75777 1118 ZX Luchthaven Schiphol / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Eaton House, Staines Road Hounslow, Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96203716.4 | 24.12.1993 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19920998901 | 30.12.1992 Original published format: US 998901 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770798 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770798 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770798 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H45/02, F16D25/0638 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F16H57/04 (EP,US);
F16H45/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D43/284 (EP,US);
F16H45/00 (EP,US);
F16H61/142 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/18] | F16H45/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/18] | Title | German: | Kupplungseinheit eines automatischen, mechanischen Getriebes | [1997/18] | English: | Clutch assembly for an automatic mechanical transmission | [1997/18] | French: | Embrayage pour une transmission mécanique automatique | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93310549.6 / EP0605234 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3306408 (KAHLE GLENN W) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 6 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1273859 (BORG WARNER LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 1 - page 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2409515 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,5,6 * page 1 - page 7; figure 2 *; | [DA]US4860861 (GOOCH DOUGLAS C [US], et al) [DA] 1* column A; figure 3A * | by applicant | US4860861 |