|
09.01.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.10.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.09.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.05.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.06.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1996 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |