|
23.11.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Title page: Decision (inter partes / revocation of patent) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.06.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.05.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |