EP0732599 - Inductive transmitters for conductor location [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADIODETECTION LIMITED Western Drive Bristol BS14 0AZ / GB | [1996/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopkin, Alan John 9 Kingfisher Close Bradley Stoke, Bristol BS12 0AN / GB | 02 /
Hore, Donald Lionel 48 Stoke Hill Stoke Bishop, Bristol BS9 1ER / GB | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Collins, John David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Collins, John David, et al Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1998/03] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1996/38] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301822.1 | 18.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | GB19950005382 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9505382 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732599 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732599 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732599 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/08 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
G01V3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/38] | Title | German: | Induktiver Sender zur Leiterlokalisierung | [1996/38] | English: | Inductive transmitters for conductor location | [1996/38] | French: | Emetteur inductif pour la localisation d'un conducteur | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US3662576 (GIRLATSCHEK SIEGFRIED) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 13 - line 35; figure 2 * [A] 5,9 [Y] 10,11; | [Y]US4112349 (WEBER HAROLD JAMES) [Y] 10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2161635 (CONSTANTIN PROKOPENKO GUSTAV) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4686454 (PECUKONIS JOSEPH P [US]) [A] 4 * column 7, line 31 - line 40 *; | [A]US2934698 (LONGLAND DONALD T) [A] 1-3,9 * figures 3,4 * |