EP0758612 - A nesting and stacking container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin Pac Mouldings Limited Deykin Avenue Witton Birmingham B6 HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states LIN PAC MOULDINGS LIMITED Deykin Avenue Witton Birmingham B6 HY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallan, Lee 19 Ashley Drive, Hertford Northwich, Cheshire CW8 3AQ / GB | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Walters, Frederick James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Walters, Frederick James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1997/44] | Walters, Frederick James Windmill Bank Sandlands Grove GB-Walton-on-the-Hill, Surrey KT20 7UZ / GB | ||
Former [1997/08] | Walters, Frederick James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303766.8 | 24.05.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | GB19950016695 | 15.08.1995 Original published format: GB 9516695 | GB19950019274 | 21.09.1995 Original published format: GB 9519274 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758612 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/04 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
B65D21/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/08] | Title | German: | In- und aufeinanderstapelbarer Behälter | [1997/08] | English: | A nesting and stacking container | [1997/08] | French: | Récipient emboîtable et empilable | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/02] | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2563188 (MANUJET) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2504889 (MANUJET) [X] 1-4,9,10,12-14,16-21 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 31; figures 1-7 *; | [X]AU3020677 (ACUMEN IND.) [X] 1-21 * page 4, line 23 - page 7, line 16; figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB1243387 (MOLDED FIBER GLASS BODY CY) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 76 - line 128; figures 1-8 * |