|
29.03.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.06.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.05.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
65 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.06.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |