|
17.01.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2012 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Request for correction |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Description |
Opposition |
31 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Description |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Description |
Opposition |
31 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2011 |
Description |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.05.2011 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
31 |
|
30.10.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
31 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
21.01.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.11.2009 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.07.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
10.11.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
61 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
32 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
17 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
64 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
28 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
42 |
|
03.06.2004 |
|
Opposition |
28 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |