EP0759441 - Methods of treating neuropeptide Y-associated conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bue-Valleskey, Juliana Maude 2422 E. Northgate Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US | 02 /
Heiman, Mark Louis 5740 Susan Drive East Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US | 03 /
Stephens, Thomas Wesley 5342 Calder Way, Apartment 510 Indianapolis, Indiana 46226 / US | 04 /
Tinsley, Frank C. 8218 Woonsocket Court Indianapolis, Indiana 46256 / US | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304723.8 | 26.06.1996 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | US19950000740 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: US 740 | US19950005910 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: US 5910 | US19950000752 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: US 752 | US19950005911 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: US 5911 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0759441 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0759441 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K38/17, // (A61K38/17, 31:00),(A61K38/17, 31:445) | [1997/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
C07D307/20 (EP,US);
C07D333/56 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/17, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/17, A61K31/34 (US,EP);
A61K38/17, A61K31/40 (US,EP);
A61K38/17, A61K31/44 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Extension states | AL | 06.07.1996 | LT | 06.07.1996 | LV | 06.07.1996 | SI | 06.07.1996 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von mit Neuropeptid Y assozierten Zuständen | [1997/09] | English: | Methods of treating neuropeptide Y-associated conditions | [1997/09] | French: | Procédés de traitement des pathologies associées aux peptides neuropeptide Y | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 01.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/29] | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/29] | Request for further processing for: | 25.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9500161 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [A] 1-18* whole document *; | [PX]WO9605309 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * claims, esp. claim 28, page 35, line 21 - page 40, line 10, page 75, line 15 - page 78, line 30, examples *; | [PX]EP0716854 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [PX] 14-18 * claims, examples *; | [E]EP0725079 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [E] 1-13 * Table 1 and claims *; | [PX]EP0754464 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [PX] 1-18 * whole document, esp. claims and examples *; | [PX]WO9702004 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * page 19, lines 28-30, claims, examples *; | [XY] - ZHANG, YIYING ET AL, "Positional cloning of the mouse obese gene and its human homolog", NATURE (LONDON) (1994), 372(6505), 425-32 CODEN: NATUAS;ISSN: 0028-0836, (1994), XP002003607 [X] 1-13 * Figures, esp. page 431 * [Y] 14-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/372425a0 | [XY] - MURAKAMI T ET AL, "CLONING OF RAT OBESE CDNA AND ITS EXPRESSION IN OBESE RATS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19950426), vol. 209, no. 3, pages 944 - 952, XP002003621 [X] 1-13 * whole document, esp. Fig.2 * [Y] 14-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.1589 | [Y] - VETTOR R. ET AL., "Induction and reversibility of an obesity syndrome by intracerebroventricular neuropeptide Y administration to normal rats", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950327), vol. 122, no. 13, Database accession no. 152145, XP002097501 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | [Y] - VETTOR R. ET AL., "Induction and reversibility of an obesity syndrome by intracerebroventricular neuropeptide Y administration to normal rats", DIABETOLOGIA, (1994), vol. 37, no. 12, pages 1202 - 8 [Y] 1-18 | [A] - CONSIDINE R V ET AL, "EVIDENCE AGAINST EITHER A PREMATURE STOP CODON OR THE ABSENCE OF OBESE GENE MRNA IN HUMAN OBESITY", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (19950601), vol. 95, no. 6, pages 2986 - 2988, XP000571447 [A] 1-13 * whole document, esp. Fig.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI118007 | [A] - EDVINSSON L ET AL, "NEUROPEPTIDE Y IN SYMPATHETIC CO-TRANSMISSION: RECENT ADVANCES IN THE SEARCH FOR NEUROPEPTIDE Y ANTAGONISTS", PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (1994), vol. 74, pages 193 - 201, XP002005758 [A] 14-18 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0773.1994.tb01098.x |