EP0755698 - Method and apparatus for therapeutic electromagnetic treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESC Medical Systems Ltd. Matam Science and Industry Park 31905 Haifa / IL | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckhouse, Shimon 27 Ester-Rabin Street Haifa 34987 / IL | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/41] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | Cardwell, Stuart Martin, et al Roystons Tower Building Water Street Liverpool, Merseyside L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305423.4 | 24.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | US19950508129 | 27.07.1995 Original published format: US 508129 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0755698 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0755698 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,US);
A61N5/0616 (KR);
A61B5/015 (KR);
A61B5/742 (KR);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00172 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00747 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00756 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1807 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung für therapeutische elektromagnetische Behandlung | [1997/05] | English: | Method and apparatus for therapeutic electromagnetic treatment | [1997/05] | French: | Méthode et appareillage destinés à un traitement thérapeutique électromagnétique | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0324490 (SAUNALUX GMBH PRODUCTS & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5330517 (MORDON SERGE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 5 * | by applicant | US5405368 | US4298005 | US4829262 | US4757431 | US4022534 | US19950477479 | US19950473532 | US19890383509 | US19920964210 |