EP0758702 - Handwash station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HMSI (Europe) Limited 16 Spear Mews London SW5 9MA / GB | [1999/03] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states HMSI LIMITED 16 Spear Mews London SW5 9MA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foster, Frank 16 Spear Mews London, SW5 9MA / GB | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305780.7 | 06.08.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | GB19950016383 | 10.08.1995 Original published format: GB 9516383 | GB19960002799 | 12.02.1996 Original published format: GB 9602799 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758702 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/05 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
E03C1/057 (EP);
A47K2210/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, SE [1997/24] |
Former [1997/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Handwaschanlage | [1997/08] | English: | Handwash station | [1997/08] | French: | Installation de lavage pour les mains | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 18.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 30.01.1998 | Observations by third parties | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/41] | 12.05.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/41] | Request for further processing for: | 31.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]WO9310311 (WASH N RINSE LTD) [DX] 1,3,5 * the whole document * [A] 4,6-23; | [A]US5217035 (VAN MARCKE KAREL C) [A] 1,18,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5318070 (SURABIAN EDWARD C) [A] 1,18,19 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5031258 (SHAW DANIEL C) [DA] 1,18,19 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5199118 (COLE CHARLES K ET AL) [DA] 1,18,19 * the whole document * | other | EP0396039 |