EP0763568 - Silicone rubber composition for fluororesin-covered fixing rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/12] | Silicone rubber composition for fluororesin-covered fixing rolls and fluororesin-covered fixing rolls | ||
[2001/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Company Limited 3-16, 2-chome, Nihonbashi-Muromachi, Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Akito, c/o Dow Corning Toray Silicone Company, Ltd., 2-2, Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba Pref. / JP | 02 /
Ushio, Yoshito, c/o Dow Corning Toray Silicone Company, Ltd., 2-2, Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba Pref. / JP | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Dowden, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306663.4 | 13.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | JP19950260851 | 13.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26085195 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0763568 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0763568 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763568 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, G03G15/20 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
G03G15/2057 (EP,US);
B29C65/485 (EP,US);
B29C65/4865 (EP,US);
B29C65/542 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/343 (EP,US);
B29C66/52272 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29C66/742 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP,US);
B29C66/91445 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
B29C65/4835 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08G77/70 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2019/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2083/00 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/12] | Title | German: | Siliconelastomerzusammensetzung für mit Fluorharz beschichtete Fixierwalzen | [2001/47] | English: | Silicone rubber composition for fluororesin-covered fixing rolls | [2001/47] | French: | Composition d'élastomère de silicone pour des rouleaux de fixage recouverts par une résine fluorée | [2001/47] |
Former [1997/12] | Siliconelastomerzusammensetzung für mit Fluorharz beschichtete Fixierwalzen und mit Fluorharz beschichtete Fixierwalzen | ||
Former [1997/12] | Silicone rubber composition for fluororesin-covered fixing rolls and fluororesin-covered fixing rolls | ||
Former [1997/12] | Composition d'élastomère de silicone pour des rouleaux de fixage recouverts par une résine fluorée et rouleaux de fixage recouverts par une résine fluorée | Examination procedure | 05.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0517524 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 2, line 22 - line 41 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]US5223344 (SUMPTER CHRIS A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 5 - line 13 * * column 5, line 19 - line 28 * * column 5, line 41 - line 42 * * column 5, line 49 - line 50 * * claims 1,19 * |