EP0770612 - Terazosin crystalline polymorph and pharmaceutical compositions thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invamed Inc. 2400 Route 130 North Dayton New Jersey 08810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states Invamed Inc. 2400 Route 130 North Dayton, New Jersey 08810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Mahendra R. 18 Timothy Lane East Brunswick, New Jersey / US | 02 /
Reddy, Kasireddy Chandraprakash 65D Phelps Avenue New Brunswick, New Jersey / US | 03 /
Dave, Pankaj J. 12 Providence Boulevard Kendall Park, New Jersey / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Lyons, Andrew John, et al ROYSTONS, Tower Building, Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA, Merseyside / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307027.1 | 26.09.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19950547209 | 24.10.1995 Original published format: US 547209 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770612 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770612 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, A61K31/505 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/18] | Title | German: | Kristaliner Polymorph von Terazosin und dies enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1997/18] | English: | Terazosin crystalline polymorph and pharmaceutical compositions thereof | [1997/18] | French: | Polymorphe crystallin de Terazosin et compositions pharmaceutiques le contenant | [1998/35] |
Former [1997/18] | Polymorphe crystalline de Terazosin et compositions pharmaceutiques la contenant | Examination procedure | 09.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 07.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.1998 | BE | 26.08.1998 | CH | 26.08.1998 | ES | 26.08.1998 | FI | 26.08.1998 | GR | 26.08.1998 | LI | 26.08.1998 | NL | 26.08.1998 | LU | 26.09.1998 | FR | 30.09.1998 | IE | 26.10.1998 | DK | 26.11.1998 | PT | 26.11.1998 | SE | 26.11.1998 | MC | 31.03.1999 | [2008/40] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 26.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 06.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
FI | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
FI | 27.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
FI | 27.11.1998 | ||
CH | 01.12.1998 | ||
LI | 01.12.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 26.10.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
FI | 27.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
FI | 27.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
GR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/26] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 26.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4251532 (ROTEMAN ROBERT) [AD] 1-4* the whole document *; | [AD]US5412095 (MORLEY JAMES A [US], et al) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * |