|
05.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.03.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
29 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2005 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.11.1996 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |