EP0779214 - Strapping machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Lem 1912 Jethro Avenue Zion, Illinois / US | 02 /
Pearson, Tim 26076 Spring Grove Road Antioch, Illinois / US | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309053.5 | 12.12.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | US19950573326 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: US 573326 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0779214 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0779214 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779214 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/22, B65B13/16, B65H26/02, B65H23/04 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
B65B13/22 (EP,US);
B24D15/00 (KR);
B65B13/16 (EP,US);
B65H23/048 (EP,US);
B65H26/02 (EP,US);
B65B2210/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/25] | Title | German: | Umreifungsvorrichtung | [1997/25] | English: | Strapping machine | [1997/25] | French: | Machine de cerclage | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1603373 (OVALSTRAPPING INC) [A] 1* page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 97; figure - *; | [A]US5377477 (HABERSTROH JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 30 - column 7, line 12; figure - * | by applicant | US5287802 |