EP0743675 - Isolation process by deposition of viscous oxide in narrow cavities and semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brouquet, Pierre Cidex 272 D, La Croix des Ayes 38920 Crolles / FR | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96400999.7 | 10.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | FR19950005710 | 15.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9505710 | [1996/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743675 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/312, H01L21/316, H01L21/762 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP,US);
H01L21/022 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,US);
H01L21/3121 (US);
H01L21/316 (US);
H01L21/76224 (EP,US);
H01L21/02129 (EP);
H01L21/02164 (EP,US);
H01L21/02216 (EP,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Isolieren durch Abscheidung eines viskosen Oxids in schmale Gräten und Halbleiteranordnung | [1996/47] | English: | Isolation process by deposition of viscous oxide in narrow cavities and semiconductor device | [1996/47] | French: | Procédé d'isolateur électrique par dépôt d'oxyde à l'état visqueux dans des cavités étroites et dispositif semi-conducteur correspondant | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/14] | 11.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0519079 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,5; claim - * * idem * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]EP0540277 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 52 - line 55; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9401885 (DOBSON CHRISTOPHER DAVID [GB]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 3 *; | [PA]WO9531823 (ELECTROTECH EQUIPMENTS LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1-6* abstract *; | [Y] - SMOLINSKY ET AL, "Material properties of spin-on silicon oxide (SOX) for fully recessed NMOS field isolation", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, (199001), vol. 137, no. 1, pages 229 - 234, XP000133070 [Y] 6 * abstract * | [AD] - DOBSON ET AL, "Advanced SiO2 planarization using silane and H2O2", SEMICONDUCTOR INTERNATIONAL, USA, (199412), vol. 17, no. 14, pages 85 - 88, XP002010758 [AD] 1-6 * abstract * |