EP0773384 - Protection flange for roller bearing, bearing equipped with it, and manufacturing method of a race ring equipped with a protection flange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF FRANCE 8, Avenue Réaumur F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [1997/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coquelin, Jean Philippe 9, rue du Bois Morin 37100 Tours / FR | 02 /
Poulle, Thierry Le Chêne 37370 Neuvy-le-Roi / FR | 03 /
Ponson, Frédéric 14, rue A. Malraux 37230 Luynes / FR | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96402338.6 | 04.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | FR19950013277 | 09.11.1995 Original published format: FR 9513277 | [1997/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773384 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773384 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/14, F16C33/80 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
F16D23/14 (EP);
F16C33/783 (EP);
F16C33/785 (EP);
F16C33/7856 (EP);
F16C33/7876 (EP);
F16C33/7889 (EP);
F16C19/163 (EP);
F16C2361/43 (EP);
F16D2300/06 (EP);
F16D2300/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/20] | Title | German: | Schutzflansch für Rollenlager, damit ausgerüstetes Lager und Herstellungsverfahren für einen Lagerring, der mit einem Schutzflansch versehen ist | [1997/20] | English: | Protection flange for roller bearing, bearing equipped with it, and manufacturing method of a race ring equipped with a protection flange | [1997/20] | French: | Flasque de protection pour roulement, roulement associé et procédé de fabrication d'une bague de roulement équipée d'un flasque de protection | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2250043 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2607885 (VALEO [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2559861 (VALEO [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2607885 | FR2559861 |